Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 4138 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17544 Week
» 70560 Month
» 190087 Year
» 3216940 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
95 |
on |
22/05/1935 |
British Railways |
40095 |
m/e |
07/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
3P |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
Sat 22/05/1935 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 21/10/1961 |
Service Life |
26 yrs, 4 mths , 29 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 06/1962 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
w/e |
21/10/1950 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
21/10/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/05/1935 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 95 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Heaton Mersey (19D) |
|
|
07/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40095 |
|
|
21/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (7A) |
|
|
04/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (7A) |
|
|
21/10/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40095 |
|
|
06/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|