Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 276 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 5676 Week
» 23728 Month
» 256648 Year
» 1922024 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 96 on 23/05/1935
British Railways 40096 m/e 03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 23/05/1935
Withdrawal Sat 21/11/1959
Service Life 24 yrs, 5 mths , 29 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 09/1960 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 23/05/1935
14B   Kentish Town on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
3C   Ryecroft (Walsall) 4w/e 22/03/1952
14B   Kentish Town 4w/e 09/08/1952
16C   Mansfield 4w/e 28/01/1956
     Withdrawn on 21/11/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 20G Hellifield 4w/e 30/03/1946
EXLOAN 20C Royston 4w/e 27/04/1946
ALLOC 14B Kentish Town w/e 26/10/1946
LOAN 3C Ryecroft (Walsall) 4w/e 22/03/1952
ALLOC 14B Kentish Town 4w/e 09/08/1952
ALLOC 16C Mansfield 4w/e 28/01/1956
WDN   w/e 21/11/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
23/05/1935 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 96
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kentish Town (14B)    
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 40096    
22/03/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Ryecroft (Walsall) (3C)    
09/08/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Kentish Town (14B)    
28/01/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Mansfield (16C)    
21/11/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 40096    
09/1960 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev