Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 308 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 5708 Week
» 23760 Month
» 256680 Year
» 1922056 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 97 on 25/05/1935
British Railways 40097 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 25/05/1935
Withdrawal Sat 05/08/1961
Service Life 26 yrs, 2 mths , 11 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1961

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 25/05/1935
21A   Saltley on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
86K   Abergavenny 4w/e 31/12/1951
86K   Abergavenny 4w/e 19/04/1952
86K   Abergavenny 3w/e 17/05/1952
87K   Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 21/05/1955
17F   Trafford Park (LMS) 4w/e 23/03/1957
9F   Heaton Mersey w/e 26/03/1960
     Withdrawn on 05/08/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 86K Abergavenny w/e 08/12/1951
ALLOC 86K Abergavenny 4w/e 19/04/1952
ALLOC 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 21/05/1955
LOAN 6K Rhyl 4w/e 23/03/1957
LOAN 17F Trafford Park (LMS) 4w/e 23/03/1957
ALLOC 17F Trafford Park (LMS) 4w/e 30/11/1957
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region m/e 30/11/1957
ALLOC 9F Heaton Mersey 4w/e 26/03/1960
WDN   w/e 05/08/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/04/1947 Glasgow Area 'A3' No. 97 has been fitted with side sheet smoke deflectors instead of the chimney wings hitherto carried by this loco. The works plate is now carried on the cab sides just under the number, but the nameplates are still on the splashers. SLS/194706
08/10/1961 Crewe Works (Scrap Yard) Paint Shop: D122-6, 42604/68, 44729/59, 44928, 45210/61, 45594, 45635/98, 46427, 49395 and the usual preserved locos. Outside Paint Shop: D127, 42447, 42655, 44733, 45077, 45316, 45699, 46225, 78017, 92133. New Electing Shop: D8, D128/9/35-7, D327, D5016/74. Outside New Erecting Shop: D5, D227, D329. Erecting Shop: D130-4, D224, 41209/39, 42050/62, 42289/99, 42465, 42607, 44666/93, 44774, 44836/90, 44934/90, 45003/67, 45102/5/8, 45204/52/62/3, 45332/40, 45454, 45549/50, 45688/90, 46114/43, 46234, 46426, 48036/46/74/85, 48283, 48494, 48611/53, 48712, 49025/70, 49381, 70052, 71000, 90216/42/71, 90486, 92013/81/94, 92150. Outside Erecting Shop: D216, 42446, 42656, 45131, 45505, 45634/83, 48717, 78043, 92123. Minor Repair Road: 45646, 48451. Works Sidings: 41279, 42425, 42574, 44708/17/20/36/7/71, 44864/71, 45154, 45571/96, 45656, 46105/7/38/60, 46406, 48088, 48217, 48477, 48624/36, 49126, 90529/61. Scrap Yard: 40075/7/97, 40118, 42506, 43325, 47421/38/62, 47634, 52389 intact. Works Shunters: D3175, 43957, 44127, 44374, 47592, 47608, 52093, 52218, 52312, 52441. SLS/196111
15/10/1961 Crewe Works (Scrap Yard-intact) Paint Shop: D124-8, 42667/8, 44679/82/3, 44729/30, 45131, 45210, 45594, 45698, 46108/60, 49395, 78043. Outside Paint Shop: D123, 41209, 42425, 42656, 44696, 44774, 44893/4, 44988, 45108, 45262, 45635/56, 48085, 48283, 48477, 48717, 49025, 49125, 70052, 71000, 92081. Works Sidings: 42619/65, 44845, 45041, 45204/85, 45549, 46425, 47448, 48660, 49070, 49381, 90218, 92024/67. Erecting Shop: D8, D129-34, 41209/79, 42050, 42289/99, 42436/65, 42607/31, 44666/93/5, 44708/17/37, 44864/76/90, 44934/90, 45038/67, 45105, 45207/52/95, 45332, 45420, 45505/50/71/3, 45688/90, 45740. 46105/7, 48036/46/74, 48217, 48365, 48451, 48611/24/36/53, 48712, 49423, 90121, 90216/42/71, 90486, 90561, 92119/50. Outside Erecting Shop: D5141, 42062, 45003, 45102, 45263, 45340, 45454, 45646, 46113/43, 46234, 46426, 48494, 92013. New Erecting Shop: D135-7, D227, D327, D5016. Outside New Erecting Shop: D329. Scrap Yard-intact: 40075/7/97, 47421/38/62, 47634 intact. Scrap Yard-just cut up: 40118, 42506, 43325, 43863, 52389. Works Shunters: 43957, 44127, 44374, 47592, 51446, 52093, 52218, 52312, 52441/59, D3763. SLS/196111

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
25/05/1935 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 97
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Saltley (21A)    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 40097    
31/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Abergavenny (86K)    
19/04/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Abergavenny (86K)    
17/05/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Abergavenny (86K)    
21/05/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) (87K)    
23/03/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (17F)    
26/03/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F)    
05/08/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 40097    
10/1961 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev