Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 243 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 5643 Week
» 23695 Month
» 256615 Year
» 1921991 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 98 on 29/05/1935
British Railways 40098 m/e 11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 29/05/1935
Withdrawal w/e Sat 17/11/1962
Service Life 27 yrs, 5 mths , 19 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Tue 05/02/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 29/05/1935
14B   Kentish Town on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
14A   Cricklewood East w/e 10/09/1949
14B   Kentish Town 4w/e 31/12/1950
86K   Abergavenny 4w/e 31/03/1952
86G   Pontypool Road 4w/e 09/10/1954
86K   Tredegar 8w/e 26/03/1955
82E   Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 26/03/1960
82G   Templecombe (S&D) 4w/e 31/12/1960
6A   Chester (MR) on 23/04/1961
6G   Llandudno Junction w/e 16/06/1962
     Withdrawn w/e 17/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 14B Kentish Town w/e 12/07/1947
ALLOC 14A Cricklewood East w/e 10/09/1949
ALLOC 14B Kentish Town m/e 31/12/1950
LOAN 86K Abergavenny w/e 16/02/1952
ALLOC 86G Pontypool Road 4w/e 09/10/1954
ALLOC 86K Tredegar 4w/e 26/03/1955
ALLOC 86K Tredegar 4w/e 10/09/1955
ALLOC 82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 26/03/1960
ALLOC 82G Templecombe (S&D) 4w/e 31/12/1960
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region m/e 30/04/1961
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) 5w/e 06/05/1961
ALLOC 6G Llandudno Junction 4w/e 30/06/1962
WDN   w/e 17/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
21/06/1959 Tredegar MPD The Barry Island Sunday excursions, for so long worked by ex-L.N.W. 0-8-0s from this shed are now worked by 66XX tanks. On shed at Tredegar, 21st June were-3700 (86K), 5727, 5768 (86B), 6439 (86A), 6600, 9662, 40098 (86K), 40161 (stored), 40171 (86K), 41201/4. SLS/195907
22/08/1959 Tredegar MPD (in store at Newport Pill) Following the allocation of 3712, 7736/87, 8711 an 9662 (w.e. 22/8) the former LMS engines are now in store at Newport Pill viz. 40098/161/71, 41201/4. 40091/145, formerly stored at Pontypool Road, have been returned to the LMR and are at Blackpool and Southport. SLS/195910
03/06/1961 Chester MPD As reported elsewhere, the GW shed has been converted to a diesel depot; the LNW shed contains the recently transferred 2-6-2Ts 40085/6/98/110/26/171/205, all stored. SLS/196107

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
29/05/1935 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 98
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kentish Town (14B)    
11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 40098    
10/09/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A)    
31/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Kentish Town (14B)    
31/03/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Abergavenny (86K)    
09/10/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Pontypool Road (86G)    
26/03/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Tredegar (86K)    
26/03/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (82E)    
31/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Templecombe (S&D) (82G)    
23/04/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
16/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G)    
17/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 40098    
05/02/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev