Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 26 Online
» 815 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 1889 Week
» 27250 Month
» 260170 Year
» 1925546 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 99 on 30/05/1935
British Railways 40099 m/e 08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 30/05/1935
Withdrawal w/e Sat 13/10/1962
Service Life 27 yrs, 4 mths , 13 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 05/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 30/05/1935
14B   Kentish Town on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
21A   Saltley 4w/e 01/11/1952
21A   Saltley 8w/e 29/11/1952
21B   Bournville 4w/e 21/02/1953
21A   Saltley 4w/e 16/05/1953
24E   Blackpool Central 4w/e 14/08/1954
24D   Lower Darwen w/e 17/06/1961
     Withdrawn w/e 13/10/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 14B Kentish Town w/e 19/10/1946
ALLOC 21A Saltley 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 21B Bournville 4w/e 21/02/1953
ALLOC 21A Saltley 4w/e 16/05/1953
LOAN 24E Blackpool Central 4w/e 04/09/1954
ALLOC 24E Blackpool Central 4w/e 23/03/1957
ALLOC 24D Lower Darwen 4w/e 01/07/1961
WDN   w/e 13/10/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
30/05/1935 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 99
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kentish Town (14B)    
08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 40099    
01/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Saltley (21A)    
29/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Saltley (21A)    
21/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Bournville (21B)    
16/05/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Saltley (21A)    
14/08/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Blackpool Central (24E)    
17/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Lower Darwen (24D)    
13/10/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 40099    
05/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev