Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 710 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14116 Week
» 67132 Month
» 186659 Year
» 3213512 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
100 |
m/e |
06/1935 |
British Railways |
40100 |
m/e |
03/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
3P |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
During 06/1935 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 18/08/1962 |
Service Life |
27 yrs, 2 mths , 18 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
Sat 23/02/1963 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
06/1935 |
14B |
|
Kentish Town |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
18/08/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
14B |
Kentish Town |
w/e |
19/10/1946 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
18/08/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1935 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 100 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kentish Town (14B) |
|
|
03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40100 |
|
|
18/08/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40100 |
|
|
23/02/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|