Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 258 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 5658 Week
» 23710 Month
» 256630 Year
» 1922006 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 101 on 06/06/1935
British Railways 40101 m/e 10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 06/06/1935
Withdrawal Sat 21/10/1961
Service Life 26 yrs, 4 mths , 15 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1962

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 06/06/1935
6C   Birkenhead Mollington Street on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
6K   Rhyl 4w/e 21/05/1955
6C   Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 08/10/1955
     Withdrawn on 21/10/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 3C Ryecroft (Walsall) 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 6K Rhyl 4w/e 21/05/1955
ALLOC 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 08/10/1955
WDN   w/e 21/10/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/06/1935 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 101
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C)    
10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 40101    
21/05/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Rhyl (6K)    
08/10/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C)    
21/10/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 40101    
03/1962 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev