Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 467 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18270 Week
» 71286 Month
» 190813 Year
» 3217666 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
102 |
on |
08/06/1935 |
British Railways |
40102 |
m/e |
06/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
3P |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
Sat 08/06/1935 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 21/10/1961 |
Service Life |
26 yrs, 4 mths , 13 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1962 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/06/1935 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 102 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C) |
|
|
06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40102 |
|
|
11/07/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bangor (6H) |
|
|
09/10/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C) |
|
|
21/10/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40102 |
|
|
03/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|