Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 33 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4948 Week
» 16185 Month
» 249105 Year
» 1914481 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 103 on 14/06/1935
British Railways 40103 m/e 06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 14/06/1935
Withdrawal Sat 21/10/1961
Service Life 26 yrs, 4 mths , 7 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 14/06/1935
11A   Carnforth on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
10A   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 26/02/1949
8E   Brunswick w/e 14/10/1950
8A   Edge Hill w/e 28/10/1950
8A   Edge Hill 4w/e 04/11/1950
7A   Llandudno Junction 4w/e 27/01/1951
5F   Uttoxeter m/e 31/01/1951
6E   Wrexham Rhosddu 4w/e 19/05/1951
6E   Wrexham Rhosddu w/e 29/09/1951
6C   Birkenhead Mollington Street 8w/e 29/11/1952
24E   Blackpool Central 4w/e 11/09/1954
     Withdrawn on 21/10/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 11B Barrow in Furness m/e 31/01/1946
ALLOC 11B Barrow in Furness 5w/e 02/03/1946
ALLOC 11A Carnforth w/e 06/09/1947
ALLOC 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 26/02/1949
LOAN 6E Wrexham Rhosddu w/e 25/02/1950
ALLOC 8E Brunswick w/e 14/10/1950
ALLOC 8A Edge Hill w/e 28/10/1950
ALLOC 5F Uttoxeter m/e 31/01/1951
LOAN 7A Llandudno Junction m/e 31/01/1951
LOAN 6E Wrexham Rhosddu w/e 07/04/1951
ALLOC 6E Wrexham Rhosddu w/e 29/09/1951
ALLOC 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 29/11/1952
LOAN 24E Blackpool Central 4w/e 02/10/1954
ALLOC 24E Blackpool Central 4w/e 23/03/1957
WDN   w/e 21/10/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/04/1947 St Rollox Works Nos. 14332, 14350, 14442, 15131 and 15357 were towed to Kilmarnock for breaking up on 28/4. H.R. No. 103 still carries the same boiler as at grouping, i.e. Class N 73, No. 1341. C.R. No. 123 now carries a Class N 17 boiler (No. 954) ex 4-4-0 No. 14111, whereas it originally had an unclassified boiler (No. 82). Ex L. & N.W.R. railcar No. R29988 which had been lying in the dump since 27/2/47 (following a collision) entered the C. & W. shop on 22/4. Nos. 15175, 16373 and 17390 have been fitted with snugs to hold the smoke-box door (as fitted on the late standard 'Compounds,' Class 2P, etc.); the handwheel is still retained, but is bolted to the door. SLS/194706
02/02/1948 St Rollox Works The first locomotive to bear the words 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' on the tender was Class '5' No. 5081 (Tender 9069), which was painted black; the lettering on the tender was in white 8' unshaded Gill Sans letters, with sufficient space between the words for the insertion of a crest. This was followed by No. 5082 (Tender 9005) on 4/2, which had been painted in the same style; both locomotives had the number prefixed by an 'M.' No. 6143 , the first 'Scot' to be repaired here since Pre-war days, arrived at the Works on 10/12 and, following a complete service repair, was despatched on 25/12; its original maroon livery having been cleaned and retouched. H.R. No. 103 and C.R. 123 have now been moved to the Varnish Shop SLS/194803

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
14/06/1935 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 103
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Carnforth (11A)    
26/02/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A)    
06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 40103    
14/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Brunswick (8E)    
28/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A)    
04/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A)    
27/01/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (7A)    
31/01/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Uttoxeter (5F)    
19/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Wrexham Rhosddu (6E)    
29/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Wrexham Rhosddu (6E)    
29/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C)    
11/09/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Blackpool Central (24E)    
21/10/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 40103    
02/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev