Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 328 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18131 Week
» 71147 Month
» 190674 Year
» 3217527 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
104 |
on |
20/06/1935 |
British Railways |
40104 |
m/e |
08/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
3P |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
Sat 20/06/1935 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 15/09/1962 |
Service Life |
27 yrs, 2 mths , 26 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
2B |
Nuneaton |
4w/e |
28/11/1953 |
ALLOC |
1A |
Willesden |
4w/e |
14/07/1956 |
ALLOC |
2B |
Nuneaton |
4w/e |
01/07/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
15/09/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/06/1935 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 104 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C) |
|
|
08/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40104 |
|
|
28/11/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B) |
|
|
11/08/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
03/11/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B) |
|
|
17/06/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
24/06/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B) |
|
|
15/09/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40104 |
|
|
04/1963 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|