Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 46 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4961 Week
» 16198 Month
» 249118 Year
» 1914494 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 104 on 20/06/1935
British Railways 40104 m/e 08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 20/06/1935
Withdrawal w/e Sat 15/09/1962
Service Life 27 yrs, 2 mths , 26 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 04/1963 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 20/06/1935
6C   Birkenhead Mollington Street on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
2B   Nuneaton 4w/e 28/11/1953
1A   Willesden 4w/e 11/08/1956
2B   Nuneaton 4w/e 03/11/1956
1A   Willesden w/e 17/06/1961
2B   Nuneaton w/e 24/06/1961
     Withdrawn w/e 15/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 2B Nuneaton 4w/e 28/11/1953
ALLOC 1A Willesden 4w/e 14/07/1956
ALLOC 2B Nuneaton 4w/e 01/07/1961
WDN   w/e 15/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
20/06/1935 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 104
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C)    
08/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 40104    
28/11/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B)    
11/08/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
03/11/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B)    
17/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
24/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B)    
15/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 40104    
04/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev