Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 294 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 5694 Week
» 23746 Month
» 256666 Year
» 1922042 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 105 on 25/06/1935
British Railways 40105 m/e 09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 25/06/1935
Withdrawal w/e Sat 21/07/1962
Service Life 27 yrs , 26 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 06/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 25/06/1935
21B   Bournville on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
86K   Abergavenny 4w/e 31/12/1951
86K   Abergavenny 4w/e 19/04/1952
86K   Abergavenny 3w/e 17/05/1952
87K   Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 30/01/1954
17F   Trafford Park (LMS) 4w/e 23/03/1957
9F   Heaton Mersey w/e 26/03/1960
     Withdrawn w/e 21/07/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 86K Abergavenny w/e 08/12/1951
ALLOC 86K Abergavenny 4w/e 19/04/1952
ALLOC 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 5w/e 30/01/1954
LOAN 6K Rhyl 4w/e 23/03/1957
LOAN 17F Trafford Park (LMS) 4w/e 23/03/1957
ALLOC 17F Trafford Park (LMS) 4w/e 30/11/1957
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region m/e 30/11/1957
ALLOC 9F Heaton Mersey 4w/e 26/03/1960
WDN   w/e 21/07/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
25/06/1935 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 105
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bournville (21B)    
09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 40105    
31/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Abergavenny (86K)    
19/04/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Abergavenny (86K)    
17/05/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Abergavenny (86K)    
30/01/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) (87K)    
23/03/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (17F)    
26/03/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F)    
21/07/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 40105    
06/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev