Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 42 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4957 Week
» 16194 Month
» 249114 Year
» 1914490 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 106 on 27/06/1935
British Railways 40106 m/e 06/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 27/06/1935
Withdrawal w/e Sat 24/11/1962
Service Life 27 yrs, 4 mths , 28 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Fri 01/02/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 27/06/1935
9A   Longsight on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
9B   Stockport Edgeley w/e 09/10/1948
6E   Wrexham Rhosddu 4w/e 03/11/1956
6E   Chester West w/e 01/11/1958
6A   Chester (MR) w/e 09/04/1960
24K   Preston w/e 10/12/1960
6A   Chester (MR) w/e 13/05/1961
6G   Llandudno Junction w/e 16/06/1962
     Withdrawn w/e 24/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 9B Stockport Edgeley w/e 09/10/1948
ALLOC 6E Wrexham Rhosddu 4w/e 03/11/1956
LOAN 6E Chester West 4w/e 01/11/1958
ALLOC 6E Chester West 4w/e 29/11/1958
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region m/e 30/11/1958
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) 5w/e 30/04/1960
LOAN 24K Preston 4w/e 31/12/1960
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 03/06/1961
ALLOC 6G Llandudno Junction 4w/e 30/06/1962
WDN   w/e 24/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
27/06/1935 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 106
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Longsight (9A)    
09/10/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B)    
06/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 40106    
03/11/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Wrexham Rhosddu (6E)    
01/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Chester West (6E)    
09/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
10/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Preston (24K)    
13/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
16/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G)    
24/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 40106    
01/02/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev