Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 41 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4956 Week
» 16193 Month
» 249113 Year
» 1914489 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 108 on 03/07/1935
British Railways 40108 m/e 12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 03/07/1935
Withdrawal w/e Sat 25/11/1961
Service Life 26 yrs, 4 mths , 22 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1962 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 03/07/1935
9A   Longsight on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
10E   Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) w/e 03/07/1948
3C   Ryecroft (Walsall) 4w/e 23/02/1952
3E   Monument Lane 8w/e 19/06/1954
5C   Stafford w/e 26/11/1960
21E   Monument Lane w/e 29/04/1961
     Withdrawn w/e 25/11/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) w/e 03/07/1948
ALLOC 3C Ryecroft (Walsall) 4w/e 23/02/1952
ALLOC 3E Monument Lane 4w/e 12/06/1954
LOAN 5C Stafford 5w/e 03/12/1960
ALLOC 21E Monument Lane 5w/e 06/05/1961
WDN   w/e 25/11/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
12/02/1962 Monument Lane MPD Monument Lane (Birmingham) was closed from 12th February as far as steam locomotives are concerned; its allocation was transferred to Aston except the diesel shunters which are left in the yards overnight but return to the shed at weekends. 2-6-2T 40108 (withdrawn 12/61) still remains at the shed. SLS/196203

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/07/1935 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 108
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Longsight (9A)    
03/07/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (10E)    
12/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 40108    
23/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Ryecroft (Walsall) (3C)    
19/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Monument Lane (3E)    
26/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Stafford (5C)    
29/04/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Monument Lane (21E)    
25/11/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 40108    
02/1962 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev