Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 823 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18626 Week
» 71642 Month
» 191169 Year
» 3218022 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
108 |
on |
03/07/1935 |
British Railways |
40108 |
m/e |
12/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
3P |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
Sat 03/07/1935 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 25/11/1961 |
Service Life |
26 yrs, 4 mths , 22 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
12/02/1962 |
Monument Lane MPD |
Monument Lane (Birmingham) was closed from 12th February as far as steam locomotives are concerned; its allocation was transferred to Aston except the diesel shunters which are left in the yards overnight but return to the shed at weekends. 2-6-2T 40108 (withdrawn 12/61) still remains at the shed. |
SLS/196203 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/07/1935 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 108 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Longsight (9A) |
|
|
03/07/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (10E) |
|
|
12/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40108 |
|
|
23/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ryecroft (Walsall) (3C) |
|
|
19/06/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Monument Lane (3E) |
|
|
26/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stafford (5C) |
|
|
29/04/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Monument Lane (21E) |
|
|
25/11/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40108 |
|
|
02/1962 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|