Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 32 Online
» 809 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 1883 Week
» 27244 Month
» 260164 Year
» 1925540 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 109 on 06/07/1935
British Railways 40109 m/e 11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 06/07/1935
Withdrawal w/e Sat 21/07/1962
Service Life 27 yrs , 15 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 05/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 06/07/1935
2E   Warwick on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
2D   Nuneaton w/e 05/06/1948
1A   Willesden w/e 17/09/1949
2B   Nuneaton w/e 10/03/1951
1A   Willesden w/e 24/03/1951
2B   Nuneaton 8w/e 29/11/1952
24E   Blackpool Central 4w/e 11/09/1954
     Withdrawn w/e 21/07/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 2D Nuneaton w/e 05/06/1948
ALLOC 1A Willesden w/e 17/09/1949
ALLOC 2B Nuneaton w/e 10/03/1951
ALLOC 1A Willesden w/e 24/03/1951
ALLOC 2B Nuneaton 4w/e 29/11/1952
LOAN 24E Blackpool Central 4w/e 02/10/1954
ALLOC 24E Blackpool Central 4w/e 23/03/1957
WDN   w/e 21/07/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/07/1935 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 109
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Warwick (2E)    
05/06/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2D)    
11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 40109    
17/09/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
10/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B)    
24/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
29/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B)    
11/09/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Blackpool Central (24E)    
21/07/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 40109    
05/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev