Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 861 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 1935 Week
» 27296 Month
» 260216 Year
» 1925592 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 110 on 10/07/1935
British Railways 40110 m/e 08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 10/07/1935
Withdrawal w/e Sat 05/05/1962
Service Life 26 yrs, 9 mths , 25 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 06/1962

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 10/07/1935
6C   Birkenhead Mollington Street on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
6E   Wrexham Rhosddu 4w/e 11/08/1956
89C   Machynlleth 4w/e 30/01/1960
84G   Shrewsbury 4w/e 27/02/1960
6A   Chester (MR) on 23/04/1961
6H   Bangor w/e 10/06/1961
1A   Willesden w/e 16/09/1961
     Withdrawn w/e 05/05/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 6E Wrexham Rhosddu 4w/e 11/08/1956
ALLOC 89C Machynlleth 4w/e 30/01/1960
ALLOC 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 27/02/1960
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region m/e 30/04/1961
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) 5w/e 06/05/1961
ALLOC 6H Bangor 4w/e 01/07/1961
ALLOC IA   4w/e 30/09/1961
WDN   w/e 05/05/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
04/01/1960 Wrexham G.C. After closure on 4th January, 1610, 3749/60, 4683, 5606/51, 6610, 8734 an 9610 were transferred to Croes Newydd, whilst 40085/110/26/205 are stored at latter shed. 40086, 82000/31 went to Machynlleth. SLS/196003
03/06/1961 Chester MPD As reported elsewhere, the GW shed has been converted to a diesel depot; the LNW shed contains the recently transferred 2-6-2Ts 40085/6/98/110/26/171/205, all stored. SLS/196107

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/07/1935 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 110
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C)    
08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 40110    
11/08/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Wrexham Rhosddu (6E)    
30/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Machynlleth (89C)    
27/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G)    
23/04/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
10/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Bangor (6H)    
16/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
05/05/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 40110    
06/1962 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev