Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 2528 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15934 Week
» 68950 Month
» 188477 Year
» 3215330 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
110 |
on |
10/07/1935 |
British Railways |
40110 |
m/e |
08/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
3P |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
Sat 10/07/1935 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 05/05/1962 |
Service Life |
26 yrs, 9 mths , 25 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 06/1962 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
04/01/1960 |
Wrexham G.C. |
After closure on 4th January, 1610, 3749/60, 4683, 5606/51, 6610, 8734 an 9610 were transferred to Croes Newydd, whilst 40085/110/26/205 are stored at latter shed. 40086, 82000/31 went to Machynlleth. |
SLS/196003 |
03/06/1961 |
Chester MPD |
As reported elsewhere, the GW shed has been converted to a diesel depot; the LNW shed contains the recently transferred 2-6-2Ts 40085/6/98/110/26/171/205, all stored. |
SLS/196107 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/07/1935 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 110 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C) |
|
|
08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40110 |
|
|
11/08/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wrexham Rhosddu (6E) |
|
|
30/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Machynlleth (89C) |
|
|
27/02/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G) |
|
|
23/04/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A) |
|
|
10/06/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bangor (6H) |
|
|
16/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
05/05/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40110 |
|
|
06/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|