Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 289 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 5689 Week
» 23741 Month
» 256661 Year
» 1922037 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 111 on 18/07/1935
British Railways 40111 m/e 03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Fri 18/07/1935
Withdrawal Fri 20/10/1961
Service Life 26 yrs, 3 mths , 2 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Sat 16/03/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 18/07/1935
14B   Kentish Town on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
     Withdrawn on 20/10/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 14B Kentish Town w/e 12/07/1947
WDN   w/e 21/10/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
18/07/1935 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 111
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kentish Town (14B)    
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 40111    
20/10/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 40111    
16/03/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev