Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 42 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4957 Week
» 16194 Month
» 249114 Year
» 1914490 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 112 on 20/07/1935
British Railways 40112 m/e 01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Mon 20/07/1935
Withdrawal Mon 19/11/1962
Service Life 27 yrs, 3 mths , 30 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 09/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 20/07/1935
14B   Kentish Town on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
20E   Manningham 4w/e 03/10/1953
56C   Copley Hill (Leeds) w/e 31/01/1959
     Withdrawn on 19/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 14B Kentish Town 4w/e 30/03/1946
ALLOC 20E Manningham 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 56C Copley Hill (Leeds) 4w/e 21/02/1959
WDN   on 19/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
20/07/1935 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 112
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kentish Town (14B)    
01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 40112    
03/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Manningham (20E)    
31/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (56C)    
19/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 40112    
09/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev