Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 516 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18319 Week
» 71335 Month
» 190862 Year
» 3217715 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
114 |
on |
03/08/1935 |
British Railways |
40114 |
m/e |
11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
3P |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
Mon 03/08/1935 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 19/11/1962 |
Service Life |
27 yrs, 3 mths , 16 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1963 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/08/1935 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 114 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kentish Town (14B) |
|
|
11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40114 |
|
|
09/10/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manningham (20E) |
|
|
31/01/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (56C) |
|
|
19/11/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40114 |
|
|
05/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|