Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 39 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4954 Week
» 16191 Month
» 249111 Year
» 1914487 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 115 on 07/08/1935
British Railways 40115 m/e 07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 07/08/1935
Withdrawal Sat 21/10/1961
Service Life 26 yrs, 2 mths , 14 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 05/1963 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 07/08/1935
14B   Kentish Town 4w/e 22/06/1946
21A   Saltley on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
16C   Mansfield w/e 28/03/1959
16B   Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 09/04/1960
     Withdrawn on 21/10/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
TOSTORE   4w/e 27/12/1958
ALLOC 16C Mansfield 4w/e 28/03/1959
ALLOC 16B Kirkby in Ashfield 5w/e 30/04/1960
WDN   w/e 21/10/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
18/05/1958 Redditch MPD This former M.R. depot, previously sub to Bournville but now in the W.R. and shown as sub to Bromsgrove has no allocation but 4 L.M.R. locos. stable overnight and on 18th May it contained 40115, 43017/49 an 43219 all of Saltley (21A). SLS/195806

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/08/1935 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 115
Built at Derby Works
   
22/06/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Kentish Town (14B)    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Saltley (21A)    
07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 40115    
28/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Mansfield (16C)    
09/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16B)    
21/10/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 40115    
05/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev