Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 773 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 1847 Week
» 27208 Month
» 260128 Year
» 1925504 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 116 on 14/08/1935
British Railways 40116 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 14/08/1935
Withdrawal w/e Sat 24/11/1962
Service Life 27 yrs, 3 mths , 10 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Thu 10/01/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 14/08/1935
15C   Leicester Midland on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
22B   Gloucester Barnwood w/e 07/05/1949
22A   Bristol Barrow Road w/e 21/10/1950
22A   Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 04/11/1950
6E   Chester West 4w/e 09/08/1958
6C   Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 20/06/1959
6H   Bangor w/e 15/07/1961
     Withdrawn w/e 24/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 21A Saltley w/e 21/06/1947
ALLOC 15C Leicester Midland w/e 28/06/1947
ALLOC 22B Gloucester Barnwood w/e 07/05/1949
ALLOC 22A Bristol Barrow Road w/e 21/10/1950
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region m/e 31/07/1958
ALLOC 6E Chester West 4w/e 09/08/1958
ALLOC 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 6w/e 11/07/1959
ALLOC 6H Bangor 5w/e 05/08/1961
WDN   w/e 24/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
14/08/1935 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 116
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Leicester Midland (15C)    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 40116    
07/05/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Barnwood (22B)    
21/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (22A)    
04/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (22A)    
09/08/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Chester West (6E)    
20/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C)    
15/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Bangor (6H)    
24/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 40116    
10/01/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev