Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 243 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 5643 Week
» 23695 Month
» 256615 Year
» 1921991 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 117 on 14/08/1935
British Railways 40117 m/e 08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Mon 14/08/1935
Withdrawal Mon 19/11/1962
Service Life 27 yrs, 3 mths , 5 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 01/1964

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 14/08/1935
21A   Saltley on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
20E   Manningham 4w/e 01/12/1951
56A   Wakefield w/e 31/01/1959
50E   Scarborough w/e 06/01/1962
     Withdrawn on 19/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 20E Manningham 4w/e 01/12/1951
ALLOC 50E Scarborough 5w/e 03/02/1962
WDN   on 19/11/1962
TOSTORE   w/e 14/08/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
14/08/1935 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 117
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Saltley (21A)    
08/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 40117    
01/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Manningham (20E)    
31/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (56A)    
06/01/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Scarborough (50E)    
19/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 40117    
01/1964 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev