Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 322 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 5722 Week
» 23774 Month
» 256694 Year
» 1922070 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 118 on 16/08/1935
British Railways 40118 m/e 02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 16/08/1935
Withdrawal Sat 19/08/1961
Service Life 26 yrs , 3 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1961

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 16/08/1935
19G   Trafford Park (LMS) on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
9F   Heaton Mersey w/e 30/09/1950
9F   Heaton Mersey 4w/e 07/10/1950
9E   Trafford Park (LMS) 4w/e 27/01/1951
9E   Trafford Park (LMS) m/e 31/01/1951
8E   Brunswick 4w/e 04/10/1952
6K   Rhyl 8w/e 19/06/1954
3E   Monument Lane 4w/e 09/10/1954
8D   Widnes w/e 30/05/1959
24L   Carnforth w/e 17/09/1960
     Withdrawn on 19/08/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 9F Heaton Mersey w/e 30/09/1950
ALLOC 9E Trafford Park (LMS) m/e 31/01/1951
ALLOC 8E Brunswick 4w/e 04/10/1952
ALLOC 6K Rhyl 4w/e 12/06/1954
ALLOC 3E Monument Lane 4w/e 02/10/1954
LOAN 8D Widnes 4w/e 30/05/1959
ALLOC 8D Widnes 3w/e 26/09/1959
WDN   w/e 19/08/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
08/10/1961 Crewe Works (Scrap Yard) Paint Shop: D122-6, 42604/68, 44729/59, 44928, 45210/61, 45594, 45635/98, 46427, 49395 and the usual preserved locos. Outside Paint Shop: D127, 42447, 42655, 44733, 45077, 45316, 45699, 46225, 78017, 92133. New Electing Shop: D8, D128/9/35-7, D327, D5016/74. Outside New Erecting Shop: D5, D227, D329. Erecting Shop: D130-4, D224, 41209/39, 42050/62, 42289/99, 42465, 42607, 44666/93, 44774, 44836/90, 44934/90, 45003/67, 45102/5/8, 45204/52/62/3, 45332/40, 45454, 45549/50, 45688/90, 46114/43, 46234, 46426, 48036/46/74/85, 48283, 48494, 48611/53, 48712, 49025/70, 49381, 70052, 71000, 90216/42/71, 90486, 92013/81/94, 92150. Outside Erecting Shop: D216, 42446, 42656, 45131, 45505, 45634/83, 48717, 78043, 92123. Minor Repair Road: 45646, 48451. Works Sidings: 41279, 42425, 42574, 44708/17/20/36/7/71, 44864/71, 45154, 45571/96, 45656, 46105/7/38/60, 46406, 48088, 48217, 48477, 48624/36, 49126, 90529/61. Scrap Yard: 40075/7/97, 40118, 42506, 43325, 47421/38/62, 47634, 52389 intact. Works Shunters: D3175, 43957, 44127, 44374, 47592, 47608, 52093, 52218, 52312, 52441. SLS/196111
15/10/1961 Crewe Works (Scrap Yard-just cut up) Paint Shop: D124-8, 42667/8, 44679/82/3, 44729/30, 45131, 45210, 45594, 45698, 46108/60, 49395, 78043. Outside Paint Shop: D123, 41209, 42425, 42656, 44696, 44774, 44893/4, 44988, 45108, 45262, 45635/56, 48085, 48283, 48477, 48717, 49025, 49125, 70052, 71000, 92081. Works Sidings: 42619/65, 44845, 45041, 45204/85, 45549, 46425, 47448, 48660, 49070, 49381, 90218, 92024/67. Erecting Shop: D8, D129-34, 41209/79, 42050, 42289/99, 42436/65, 42607/31, 44666/93/5, 44708/17/37, 44864/76/90, 44934/90, 45038/67, 45105, 45207/52/95, 45332, 45420, 45505/50/71/3, 45688/90, 45740. 46105/7, 48036/46/74, 48217, 48365, 48451, 48611/24/36/53, 48712, 49423, 90121, 90216/42/71, 90486, 90561, 92119/50. Outside Erecting Shop: D5141, 42062, 45003, 45102, 45263, 45340, 45454, 45646, 46113/43, 46234, 46426, 48494, 92013. New Erecting Shop: D135-7, D227, D327, D5016. Outside New Erecting Shop: D329. Scrap Yard-intact: 40075/7/97, 47421/38/62, 47634 intact. Scrap Yard-just cut up: 40118, 42506, 43325, 43863, 52389. Works Shunters: 43957, 44127, 44374, 47592, 51446, 52093, 52218, 52312, 52441/59, D3763. SLS/196111

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
16/08/1935 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 118
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Trafford Park (LMS) (19G)    
02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 40118    
30/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F)    
07/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F)    
27/01/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E)    
31/01/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E)    
04/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Brunswick (8E)    
19/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Rhyl (6K)    
09/10/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Monument Lane (3E)    
30/05/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Widnes (8D)    
17/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (24L)    
19/08/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 40118    
10/1961 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev