Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 45 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4960 Week
» 16197 Month
» 249117 Year
» 1914493 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 119 on 21/08/1935
British Railways 40119 m/e 07/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 21/08/1935
Withdrawal Sat 18/08/1962
Service Life 26 yrs, 11 mths , 28 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Wed 13/03/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 21/08/1935
22A   Bristol Barrow Road on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
14B   Kentish Town w/e 17/07/1948
     Withdrawn on 18/08/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 22A Bristol Barrow Road w/e 23/11/1946
ALLOC 14B Kentish Town w/e 17/07/1948
WDN   w/e 18/08/1962
ALLOC 14A Cricklewood East 4w/e 01/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
21/08/1935 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 119
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bristol Barrow Road (22A)    
17/07/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Kentish Town (14B)    
07/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 40119    
18/08/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 40119    
13/03/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev