Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 1010 Today
» 887 Yesterday
» 6812 Week
» 18049 Month
» 250969 Year
» 1916345 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 122 m/e 08/1935
British Railways 40122 m/e 09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service During 08/1935
Withdrawal w/e Sat 23/06/1962
Service Life 26 yrs, 10 mths , 23 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 05/1963 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1935
5D   Stoke on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
6G   Llandudno Junction 4w/e 12/07/1952
3B   Bushbury 4w/e 09/08/1952
3C   Ryecroft (Walsall) 4w/e 21/05/1955
6H   Bangor 8w/e 16/07/1955
1A   Willesden 4w/e 11/08/1956
2B   Nuneaton 4w/e 03/11/1956
2C   Warwick 4w/e 20/04/1957
9G   Gorton w/e 15/11/1958
9A   Longsight w/e 14/03/1959
5C   Stafford w/e 09/05/1959
9A   Longsight w/e 18/07/1959
8D   Widnes w/e 28/05/1960
6C   Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 16/07/1960
6G   Llandudno Junction w/e 10/06/1961
     Withdrawn w/e 23/06/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 6G Llandudno Junction 4w/e 12/07/1952
ALLOC 3B Bushbury 4w/e 09/08/1952
ALLOC 3C Ryecroft (Walsall) 4w/e 21/05/1955
ALLOC 6H Bangor 4w/e 16/07/1955
ALLOC 1A Willesden 4w/e 14/07/1956
ALLOC 2B Nuneaton 4w/e 03/11/1956
ALLOC 2C Warwick 4w/e 20/04/1957
ALLOC 9G Gorton 4w/e 29/11/1958
ALLOC 9A Longsight 4w/e 28/03/1959
LOAN 5C Stafford 4w/e 30/05/1959
EXLOAN 9A Longsight 8w/e 05/09/1959
ALLOC 8D Widnes 4w/e 28/05/1960
ALLOC 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 30/07/1960
ALLOC 6G Llandudno Junction 4w/e 01/07/1961
WDN   w/e 23/06/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
10/08/1947 Horwich Works On 10/8 the following locos. were under repair: 80, 122, 145, 2704, 2747, 2791, 2947, 2970, 5102, 9505, 9542, 9578, 9604, 9645, 9658, 9667, 10429, 10622, 10639, 10648, 10660, 10720, 10743, 10777 (with 10812's bunker), 10892, 10898, 11253, 11319, 11514, 12037, 12047, 12119, 12159, 12171, 12184, 12196, 12363, 12382, 12581, 12598 and 12870. On the same date Nos. 2722, 2729, 2918, 5340 (with a small 3500 gal. tender) 9529, 10640, 10944, 11486 an 12299 were awaiting repair. SLS/194710

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1935 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 122
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stoke (5D)    
09/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 40122    
12/07/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G)    
09/08/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Bushbury (3B)    
21/05/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Ryecroft (Walsall) (3C)    
16/07/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Bangor (6H)    
11/08/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
03/11/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B)    
20/04/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Warwick (2C)    
15/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (9G)    
14/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Longsight (9A)    
09/05/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Stafford (5C)    
18/07/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Longsight (9A)    
28/05/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Widnes (8D)    
16/07/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C)    
10/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G)    
23/06/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 40122    
05/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev