Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 22 Today
» 818 Yesterday
» 840 Week
» 17791 Month
» 170744 Year
» 1836120 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 123 on 03/09/1935
British Railways 40123 m/e 10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 03/09/1935
Withdrawal Sat 21/10/1961
Service Life 26 yrs, 1 mth , 18 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 07/1962

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 03/09/1935
7A   Llandudno Junction on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
     Withdrawn on 21/10/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   w/e 21/10/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/04/1947 St Rollox Works Nos. 14332, 14350, 14442, 15131 and 15357 were towed to Kilmarnock for breaking up on 28/4. H.R. No. 103 still carries the same boiler as at grouping, i.e. Class N 73, No. 1341. C.R. No. 123 now carries a Class N 17 boiler (No. 954) ex 4-4-0 No. 14111, whereas it originally had an unclassified boiler (No. 82). Ex L. & N.W.R. railcar No. R29988 which had been lying in the dump since 27/2/47 (following a collision) entered the C. & W. shop on 22/4. Nos. 15175, 16373 and 17390 have been fitted with snugs to hold the smoke-box door (as fitted on the late standard 'Compounds,' Class 2P, etc.); the handwheel is still retained, but is bolted to the door. SLS/194706
31/05/1947 St Rollox Works No. 14398 Ben Alder has been given a complete overhaul here (31/5). 'Clan' goods No. 17954 left the works w/e 10/5 and operated from Balornock for a few days, but on 17/5 it was being used by Polmadie, as shed pilot. A further 'Clan' goods, No. 17956 , arrived for repair on 21/5. C.R. No. 123 has now had all brass and copper work polished, also the buffer heads. No. 16027 (4A) arrived for repair on 3/5 and still carries the C.R. building plates, which read: 'St. Rollox Works, 1895.' It is interesting to note that whilst this is a Macintosh engine, it is fitted with Drummond type wheels, i.e., with 8 T-section spokes, instead of the standard 12-spoke design. The only withdrawn loco. at present (1/6) on the dump is ex G. & S.W.R. 2-6-0 No. 17829 . SLS/194708
02/02/1948 St Rollox Works The first locomotive to bear the words 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' on the tender was Class '5' No. 5081 (Tender 9069), which was painted black; the lettering on the tender was in white 8' unshaded Gill Sans letters, with sufficient space between the words for the insertion of a crest. This was followed by No. 5082 (Tender 9005) on 4/2, which had been painted in the same style; both locomotives had the number prefixed by an 'M.' No. 6143 , the first 'Scot' to be repaired here since Pre-war days, arrived at the Works on 10/12 and, following a complete service repair, was despatched on 25/12; its original maroon livery having been cleaned and retouched. H.R. No. 103 and C.R. 123 have now been moved to the Varnish Shop SLS/194803

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/09/1935 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 123
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Llandudno Junction (7A)    
10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 40123    
21/10/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 40123    
07/1962 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev