Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 323 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 5723 Week
» 23775 Month
» 256695 Year
» 1922071 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 125 on 07/09/1935
British Railways 40125 m/e 06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 07/09/1935
Withdrawal Sat 21/11/1959
Service Life 24 yrs, 2 mths , 14 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 08/1962

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 07/09/1935
5D   Stoke on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
8D   Widnes w/e 14/02/1948
6G   Llandudno Junction 4w/e 12/07/1952
3B   Bushbury 4w/e 09/08/1952
1A   Willesden m/e 16/06/1956
8B   Warrington Dallam 8w/e 05/10/1957
     Withdrawn on 21/11/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 8D Widnes w/e 07/02/1948
ALLOC 8D Widnes w/e 14/02/1948
ALLOC 6G Llandudno Junction 4w/e 12/07/1952
ALLOC 3B Bushbury 4w/e 09/08/1952
ALLOC 1A Willesden w/e 16/06/1956
ALLOC 8B Warrington Dallam 4w/e 05/10/1957
WDN   w/e 21/11/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/09/1935 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 125
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stoke (5D)    
14/02/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Widnes (8D)    
06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 40125    
12/07/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G)    
09/08/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Bushbury (3B)    
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
05/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B)    
21/11/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 40125    
08/1962 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev