Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 839 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 1913 Week
» 27274 Month
» 260194 Year
» 1925570 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 127 on 13/09/1935
British Railways 40127 m/e 12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 13/09/1935
Withdrawal Sat 21/11/1959
Service Life 24 yrs, 2 mths , 8 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 09/1961

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 13/09/1935
5D   Stoke on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
2D   Nuneaton 5w/e 24/12/1949
8E   Brunswick w/e 14/10/1950
8E   Brunswick 4w/e 04/11/1950
     Withdrawn on 21/11/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 2D Nuneaton w/e 17/12/1949
LOAN 6E Wrexham Rhosddu w/e 25/02/1950
ALLOC 8E Brunswick w/e 14/10/1950
WDN   w/e 21/11/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
13/09/1935 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 127
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stoke (5D)    
12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 40127    
24/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2D)    
14/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Brunswick (8E)    
04/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Brunswick (8E)    
21/11/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 40127    
09/1961 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev