Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 42 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4957 Week
» 16194 Month
» 249114 Year
» 1914490 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 128 on 18/09/1935
British Railways 40128 m/e 03/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 18/09/1935
Withdrawal w/e Sat 21/07/1962
Service Life 26 yrs, 10 mths , 3 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Thu 15/11/1962

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 18/09/1935
5D   Stoke on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
6E   Wrexham Rhosddu 4w/e 19/05/1951
6E   Wrexham Rhosddu w/e 29/09/1951
6C   Birkenhead Mollington Street 8w/e 29/11/1952
6E   Wrexham Rhosddu 4w/e 08/09/1956
6G   Llandudno Junction w/e 10/01/1959
6G   Llandudno Junction w/e 28/03/1959
1A   Willesden w/e 17/12/1960
6G   Llandudno Junction w/e 31/12/1960
1A   Willesden w/e 16/09/1961
     Withdrawn w/e 21/07/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 6E Wrexham Rhosddu w/e 07/04/1951
ALLOC 6E Wrexham Rhosddu w/e 29/09/1951
ALLOC 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 29/11/1952
ALLOC 6E Wrexham Rhosddu 4w/e 08/09/1956
LOAN 6G Llandudno Junction 5w/e 31/01/1959
ALLOC 6G Llandudno Junction 4w/e 28/03/1959
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region m/e 31/03/1959
ALLOC 1A Willesden 4w/e 30/09/1961
WDN   w/e 21/07/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
18/09/1935 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 128
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stoke (5D)    
03/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 40128    
19/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Wrexham Rhosddu (6E)    
29/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Wrexham Rhosddu (6E)    
29/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C)    
08/09/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Wrexham Rhosddu (6E)    
10/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G)    
28/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G)    
17/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
31/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G)    
16/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
21/07/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 40128    
15/11/1962 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev