Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 45 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4960 Week
» 16197 Month
» 249117 Year
» 1914493 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 130 on 21/09/1935
British Railways 40130 m/e 06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 21/09/1935
Withdrawal Sat 21/10/1961
Service Life 26 yrs , 1 mth

Disposal
Scrapping During 07/1962

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 21/09/1935
6A   Chester (MR) on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
7A   Llandudno Junction w/e 17/01/1948
     Withdrawn on 21/10/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 7A Llandudno Junction w/e 17/01/1948
WDN   w/e 21/10/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
21/09/1935 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 130
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Chester (MR) (6A)    
17/01/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (7A)    
06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 40130    
21/10/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 40130    
07/1962 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev