Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 742 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 1816 Week
» 27177 Month
» 260097 Year
» 1925473 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 131 on 26/09/1935
British Railways 40131 m/e 05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 26/09/1935
Withdrawal Sat 21/10/1961
Service Life 26 yrs , 25 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1962

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 26/09/1935
6C   Birkenhead Mollington Street on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
     Withdrawn on 21/10/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   w/e 21/10/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
21/04/1948 Horwich Works On 21/4 the following locomotives were in the Erecting Shop: Nos. 133/49, 205, 2701/82/86, 2958, 3841, 4060, 4220, 4307/68, 4497, 4517/48, 5079, 8751/61, 9501/08/20/37, 10630, 10953, 11313/20, 11425, 12089, 12133/71, 12268, 12399, 12411, 12522, 12615 an 12870, while awaiting Works were the following: Nos. 131, 2646, 2796, 2964, 9545, 9607, 10852, 11410, 12152/60, 12397, 12438/67, 12582, 12821/39. Nos. 10429, 10717, 10901, 12247/56, 12422, 12824/37/61 an 12902 were on the scrap road; the boiler of No. 11116 is still there. Nos. R10600 an R10617 are still standing between the Erecting and Paint Shops-the glass having been removed from the coach windows. The only renumbered locomotive seen here with a new cast smoke-box numberplate was No. 45220, the rest not having received them yet. SLS/194806

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
26/09/1935 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 131
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 40131    
21/10/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 40131    
03/1962 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev