Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 46 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4961 Week
» 16198 Month
» 249118 Year
» 1914494 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 132 on 28/09/1935
British Railways 40132 m/e 08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 28/09/1935
Withdrawal Sat 21/10/1961
Service Life 26 yrs , 23 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1962

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 28/09/1935
6C   Birkenhead Mollington Street on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
6H   Bangor 4w/e 12/07/1952
6C   Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 04/10/1952
6H   Bangor 4w/e 03/11/1956
     Withdrawn on 21/10/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 6H Bangor 4w/e 12/07/1952
ALLOC 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 04/10/1952
ALLOC 6H Bangor 4w/e 03/11/1956
WDN   w/e 21/10/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/08/1952 Bangor MPD Among the 32 locomotives shedded at 6H, are Webb 2-4-2T 46604 an 46701: 'Coal tank' 58903 and 'Cauliflower' 58375. The balance is divided between light 2-6-2Ts, three 'class 5' 4-6-0's, one Stanier 2-6-2T (40132): 2-6-4Ts, three ex-L47 0-6-0's and two '4F' 0-6-0's (44445 and 44305). The last two engines have been on Bangor Shed strength for seven years. SLS/195211
09/12/1961 Horwich Works (Works Yard) Erecting Shop: D4112 (finished), D4113/4 (engines in), D4115/6 (frames), 12004/20/7, 42702/17, 42827, 42953/82, 43007/52, 43856, 43976, 44056/146/277, 44342/52/67/73, 44602, 48136/64, 48634, 48741, 76051/79, Wren. Car Erecting Shop: uM28219/348/590, uM29023/249/575/655/723. Casual Repair Shop: 43009, 48522/36, 48717. Diesel Test House: 12014. Works Yard: 40132, 42703/63, 42862/3, 42983, 44152, 44481, 44564, 48201, 48333/8, 48423, 48558, 48770, uM28321M, uM29555M-both damaged. Paint Shop: D4111 (new), 42799, uM28394, uM29141, uM29836, LYR 1008, FR 3. Scrap Yard: 51419, 51537 (being cut up), 42893 (remains). Works Shunters: 47402/29, 11304/5/24/68. SLS/196201
08/04/1962 Crewe Works (Scrap Road) New Erecting Shop: D52 (Complete), D1037-9 (Body shells), D231/94/5, D8015, E3020. New Erecting Shop Yard: D303, 42640. Erecting Shop: D53-5 (Engines in), D56/7, D1035/6 (Body Sides only), D7, D212/3/5/7/26/92, D325, D8005, 41225/39/41, 42102/5/33/5, 42249/96, 42555/6, 42644/86, 44741, 44815, 44911, 45134, 45202/10/24/31/62, 45375, 45557/71/90/1/9, 45632/3/54, 45742, 46111/22/9, 46238, 48452, 48504, 70015/20/51, 92045, 92120. Erecting Shop Yard: D335, D8019, 42586, 45097, 45370, 45434, 46132/45/56, 46222/39/42, 78013. Paint Shop: D50/1/64-7, 45242, 46240, 49395, 90606 and an unidentified electric loco. Paint Shop Yard: D235, 90178. Works Yard: 42256, 42494, 42514, 44778, 44862, 44932/64, 45535, 45671, 46118/48, 48600, 70014, 90167, 90201, 90520, 92022/46/54. Scrap Road: 40024, 40132, 41900, 46204/11/2, 49134 complete with 40180, 45519, 51222 just cut-up. Works Shunters: 43957, 44363/73, 47592, 47618/61, 51412, 52093, 52312, 52441, D3245. SLS/196205

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
28/09/1935 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 132
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C)    
08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 40132    
12/07/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Bangor (6H)    
04/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C)    
03/11/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Bangor (6H)    
21/10/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 40132    
03/1962 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev