Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 818 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 1892 Week
» 27253 Month
» 260173 Year
» 1925549 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 134 on 04/10/1935
British Railways 40134 m/e 12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 04/10/1935
Withdrawal Sat 21/10/1961
Service Life 26 yrs , 17 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1962

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 04/10/1935
7A   Llandudno Junction on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
7B   Bangor w/e 28/08/1948
8D   Widnes w/e 15/09/1951
8D   Widnes 4w/e 06/10/1951
     Withdrawn on 21/10/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 7B Bangor w/e 28/08/1948
LOAN 13A Trafford Park (LMS) w/e 11/02/1950
EXLOAN 7B Bangor w/e 06/05/1950
ALLOC 8D Widnes w/e 15/09/1951
WDN   w/e 21/10/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/10/1935 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 134
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Llandudno Junction (7A)    
28/08/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Bangor (7B)    
12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 40134    
15/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Widnes (8D)    
06/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Widnes (8D)    
21/10/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 40134    
11/1962 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev