Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 41 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4956 Week
» 16193 Month
» 249113 Year
» 1914489 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 135 on 08/10/1935
British Railways 40135 m/e 08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 08/10/1935
Withdrawal w/e Sat 24/11/1962
Service Life 27 yrs, 1 mth , 16 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 08/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 08/10/1935
2E   Warwick on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
2D   Nuneaton w/e 05/06/1948
1A   Willesden w/e 17/09/1949
2B   Nuneaton 4w/e 06/09/1952
6C   Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 06/11/1954
2B   Nuneaton 4w/e 04/10/1958
     Withdrawn w/e 24/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 2D Nuneaton w/e 05/06/1948
ALLOC 1A Willesden w/e 17/09/1949
ALLOC 2B Nuneaton 4w/e 06/09/1952
ALLOC 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 30/10/1954
ALLOC 2B Nuneaton 4w/e 04/10/1958
WDN   w/e 24/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/10/1935 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 135
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Warwick (2E)    
05/06/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2D)    
08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 40135    
17/09/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
06/09/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B)    
06/11/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C)    
04/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B)    
24/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 40135    
08/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev