Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 819 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 1893 Week
» 27254 Month
» 260174 Year
» 1925550 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 136 on 10/10/1935
British Railways 40136 m/e 06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 10/10/1935
Withdrawal Sat 21/10/1961
Service Life 26 yrs , 11 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 04/1962

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 10/10/1935
6C   Birkenhead Mollington Street on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
11A   Carnforth w/e 27/03/1948
9A   Longsight w/e 16/10/1948
6C   Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 07/09/1957
6H   Bangor 8w/e 05/10/1957
     Withdrawn on 21/10/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 11A Carnforth w/e 27/03/1948
ALLOC 9A Longsight w/e 16/10/1948
ALLOC 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 07/09/1957
ALLOC 6H Bangor 4w/e 05/10/1957
WDN   w/e 21/10/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/10/1935 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 136
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C)    
27/03/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (11A)    
16/10/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Longsight (9A)    
06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 40136    
07/09/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C)    
05/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Bangor (6H)    
21/10/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 40136    
04/1962 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev