Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 260 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 5660 Week
» 23712 Month
» 256632 Year
» 1922008 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 137 on 15/10/1935
British Railways 40137 m/e 09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 15/10/1935
Withdrawal w/e Sat 17/11/1962
Service Life 27 yrs, 1 mth , 2 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Fri 01/02/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 15/10/1935
7A   Llandudno Junction on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
2B   Nuneaton w/e 21/10/1950
2B   Nuneaton 4w/e 04/11/1950
8D   Widnes 4w/e 12/07/1952
8D   Widnes 4w/e 12/07/1952
6C   Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 16/07/1960
6G   Llandudno Junction w/e 10/06/1961
     Withdrawn w/e 17/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 2B Nuneaton w/e 21/10/1950
ALLOC 6G Llandudno Junction 4w/e 12/07/1952
ALLOC 8D Widnes 4w/e 12/07/1952
ALLOC 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 30/07/1960
ALLOC 6G Llandudno Junction 4w/e 01/07/1961
WDN   w/e 17/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
15/10/1935 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 137
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Llandudno Junction (7A)    
09/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 40137    
21/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B)    
04/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B)    
12/07/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Widnes (8D)    
12/07/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Widnes (8D)    
16/07/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C)    
10/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G)    
17/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 40137    
01/02/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev