Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 31 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4946 Week
» 16183 Month
» 249103 Year
» 1914479 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 138 on 17/10/1935
British Railways 40138 m/e 11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 17/10/1935
Withdrawal w/e Sat 22/09/1962
Service Life 26 yrs, 11 mths , 5 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 05/1963 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 17/10/1935
9A   Longsight on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
9B   Stockport Edgeley w/e 09/10/1948
2B   Nuneaton 4w/e 03/11/1956
24L   Carnforth w/e 10/02/1962
6G   Llandudno Junction w/e 23/06/1962
     Withdrawn w/e 22/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 9A Longsight w/e 22/11/1947
ALLOC 9B Stockport Edgeley w/e 09/10/1948
ALLOC 2B Nuneaton 4w/e 03/11/1956
ALLOC 24L Carnforth 5w/e 03/03/1962
ALLOC 6G Llandudno Junction 4w/e 30/06/1962
WDN   w/e 22/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
17/10/1935 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 138
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Longsight (9A)    
09/10/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B)    
11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 40138    
03/11/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B)    
10/02/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (24L)    
23/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G)    
22/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 40138    
05/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev