Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 852 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 1926 Week
» 27287 Month
» 260207 Year
» 1925583 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 140 on 24/10/1935
British Railways 40140 m/e 05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 24/10/1935
Withdrawal Sat 04/11/1961
Service Life 26 yrs , 11 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1961

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 24/10/1935
16A   Nottingham on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
20C   Royston w/e 01/09/1951
20C   Royston 4w/e 08/09/1951
20A   Holbeck (MR) 8w/e 16/07/1955
     Withdrawn on 04/11/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 16A Nottingham 5w/e 02/03/1946
ALLOC 20C Royston w/e 01/09/1951
ALLOC 20A Holbeck (MR) 4w/e 16/07/1955
WDN   on 03/11/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
24/10/1935 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 140
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Nottingham (16A)    
05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 40140    
01/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Royston (20C)    
08/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Royston (20C)    
16/07/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (20A)    
11/1961 Scrapped Scrapped    
04/11/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 40140    

prev prev