Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 255 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 5655 Week
» 23707 Month
» 256627 Year
» 1922003 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 141 on 30/10/1935
British Railways 40141 m/e 08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 30/10/1935
Withdrawal Sat 21/10/1961
Service Life 25 yrs, 11 mths , 21 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 06/1962

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 30/10/1935
15C   Leicester Midland on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
15D   Bedford w/e 02/07/1949
15D   Bedford 5w/e 16/07/1949
86K   Abergavenny 4w/e 31/12/1951
87K   Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 14/08/1954
17F   Trafford Park (LMS) 4w/e 23/03/1957
     Withdrawn on 21/10/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 15D Bedford w/e 02/07/1949
LOAN 86K Abergavenny w/e 08/12/1951
ALLOC 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 19/06/1954
LOAN 3E Monument Lane 4w/e 23/03/1957
LOAN 17F Trafford Park (LMS) 4w/e 23/03/1957
ALLOC 17F Trafford Park (LMS) 4w/e 30/11/1957
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region m/e 30/11/1957
WDN   w/e 21/10/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
30/10/1935 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 141
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Leicester Midland (15C)    
02/07/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Bedford (15D)    
16/07/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Bedford (15D)    
08/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 40141    
31/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Abergavenny (86K)    
14/08/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) (87K)    
23/03/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (17F)    
21/10/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 40141    
06/1962 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev