Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 41 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4956 Week
» 16193 Month
» 249113 Year
» 1914489 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 142 on 01/11/1935
British Railways 40142 m/e 06/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 01/11/1935
Withdrawal Sat 22/07/1961
Service Life 25 yrs, 8 mths , 21 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1962

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 01/11/1935
22C   Bath Green Park (S&D) on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
22B   Gloucester Barnwood w/e 29/05/1948
14B   Kentish Town w/e 17/07/1948
16B   Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 11/04/1961
     Withdrawn on 22/07/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
EXLOAN 17B Burton m/e 31/01/1946
LOAN 21A Saltley w/e 03/05/1947
EXLOAN 17A Derby w/e 21/06/1947
ALLOC 22A Bristol Barrow Road w/e 11/10/1947
ALLOC 22C Bath Green Park (S&D) w/e 25/10/1947
ALLOC 22B Gloucester Barnwood w/e 29/05/1948
ALLOC 14B Kentish Town w/e 17/07/1948
ALLOC 16B Kirkby in Ashfield 4w/e 01/04/1961
WDN   w/e 22/07/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/11/1935 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 142
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bath Green Park (S&D) (22C)    
29/05/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Barnwood (22B)    
17/07/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Kentish Town (14B)    
06/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 40142    
11/04/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16B)    
22/07/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 40142    
02/1962 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev