Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 239 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 5639 Week
» 23691 Month
» 256611 Year
» 1921987 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 143 on 05/11/1935
British Railways 40143 m/e 11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 05/11/1935
Withdrawal Sat 21/10/1961
Service Life 25 yrs, 11 mths , 16 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 05/11/1935
2D   Nuneaton on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
7B   Bangor w/e 02/10/1948
7A   Llandudno Junction w/e 15/09/1951
7A   Llandudno Junction 4w/e 06/10/1951
5D   Stoke 4w/e 26/01/1952
6K   Rhyl 8w/e 14/06/1952
5D   Stoke 4w/e 12/07/1952
2B   Nuneaton 4w/e 04/10/1952
5D   Stoke 5w/e 03/01/1953
8B   Warrington Dallam 4w/e 05/09/1953
9A   Longsight 4w/e 26/01/1957
8D   Widnes 4w/e 23/03/1957
     Withdrawn on 21/10/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 7B Bangor w/e 02/10/1948
ALLOC 7A Llandudno Junction w/e 15/09/1951
ALLOC 5D Stoke 4w/e 26/01/1952
LOAN 6K Rhyl 4w/e 17/05/1952
ALLOC 5D Stoke 4w/e 12/07/1952
LOAN 2B Nuneaton 4w/e 04/10/1952
EXLOAN 5D Stoke 4w/e 27/12/1952
ALLOC 8B Warrington Dallam 4w/e 05/09/1953
ALLOC 9A Longsight 4w/e 26/01/1957
LOAN 8D Widnes 4w/e 23/03/1957
ALLOC 8D Widnes 4w/e 20/04/1957
WDN   w/e 21/10/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/11/1935 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 143
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Nuneaton (2D)    
02/10/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Bangor (7B)    
11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 40143    
15/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (7A)    
06/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (7A)    
26/01/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
14/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Rhyl (6K)    
12/07/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
04/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B)    
03/01/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
05/09/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B)    
26/01/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Longsight (9A)    
23/03/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Widnes (8D)    
21/10/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 40143    
02/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev