Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 317 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 5717 Week
» 23769 Month
» 256689 Year
» 1922065 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 144 on 13/11/1935
British Railways 40144 m/e 02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 13/11/1935
Withdrawal w/e Sat 23/12/1961
Service Life 26 yrs, 1 mth , 10 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Fri 21/09/1962

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 13/11/1935
2A   Rugby on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
10A   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 26/02/1949
8A   Edge Hill w/e 29/04/1950
6A   Chester (MR) 2w/e 17/06/1950
8A   Edge Hill 4w/e 04/11/1950
5D   Stoke 4w/e 27/01/1951
5D   Stoke m/e 31/01/1951
6A   Chester (MR) w/e 10/03/1951
6A   Chester (MR) 4w/e 24/03/1951
5D   Stoke 4w/e 19/05/1951
6C   Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 01/12/1951
21B   Bournville 4w/e 23/03/1957
1A   Willesden w/e 05/08/1961
     Withdrawn w/e 23/12/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 26/02/1949
ALLOC 8A Edge Hill w/e 29/04/1950
LOAN 6A Chester (MR) w/e 03/06/1950
EXLOAN 8A Edge Hill w/e 14/10/1950
ALLOC 5D Stoke m/e 31/01/1951
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) w/e 10/03/1951
EXLOAN 5D Stoke w/e 07/04/1951
ALLOC 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 01/12/1951
ALLOC 1A Willesden 5w/e 05/08/1961
WDN   w/e 23/12/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
13/11/1935 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 144
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Rugby (2A)    
02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 40144    
26/02/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A)    
29/04/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A)    
17/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
04/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A)    
27/01/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
31/01/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
10/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
24/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
19/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
01/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C)    
23/03/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Bournville (21B)    
05/08/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
23/12/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 40144    
21/09/1962 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev