Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 243 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 5643 Week
» 23695 Month
» 256615 Year
» 1921991 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 145 on 20/07/1937
British Railways 40145 m/e 06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 20/07/1937
Withdrawal w/e Sat 22/09/1962
Service Life 25 yrs, 2 mths , 2 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 06/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 20/07/1937
15C   Leicester Midland on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
86K   Abergavenny 4w/e 31/12/1951
86K   Abergavenny 4w/e 19/04/1952
86K   Abergavenny 3w/e 17/05/1952
86G   Pontypool Road 4w/e 26/12/1953
27C   Southport w/e 29/08/1959
     Withdrawn w/e 22/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 86K Abergavenny w/e 08/12/1951
ALLOC 86K Abergavenny 4w/e 19/04/1952
ALLOC 86G Pontypool Road 4w/e 26/12/1953
LOAN 27C Southport 8w/e 05/09/1959
ALLOC 27C Southport 3w/e 26/09/1959
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region m/e 30/09/1959
WDN   w/e 22/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
10/08/1947 Horwich Works On 10/8 the following locos. were under repair: 80, 122, 145, 2704, 2747, 2791, 2947, 2970, 5102, 9505, 9542, 9578, 9604, 9645, 9658, 9667, 10429, 10622, 10639, 10648, 10660, 10720, 10743, 10777 (with 10812's bunker), 10892, 10898, 11253, 11319, 11514, 12037, 12047, 12119, 12159, 12171, 12184, 12196, 12363, 12382, 12581, 12598 and 12870. On the same date Nos. 2722, 2729, 2918, 5340 (with a small 3500 gal. tender) 9529, 10640, 10944, 11486 an 12299 were awaiting repair. SLS/194710
22/08/1959 Tredegar MPD (in store at Newport Pill) Following the allocation of 3712, 7736/87, 8711 an 9662 (w.e. 22/8) the former LMS engines are now in store at Newport Pill viz. 40098/161/71, 41201/4. 40091/145, formerly stored at Pontypool Road, have been returned to the LMR and are at Blackpool and Southport. SLS/195910

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
20/07/1937 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 145
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Leicester Midland (15C)    
06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 40145    
31/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Abergavenny (86K)    
19/04/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Abergavenny (86K)    
17/05/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Abergavenny (86K)    
26/12/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Pontypool Road (86G)    
29/08/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
22/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 40145    
06/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev