Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 42 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4957 Week
» 16194 Month
» 249114 Year
» 1914490 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 146 on 04/08/1937
British Railways 40146 m/e 06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 04/08/1937
Withdrawal w/e Sat 04/08/1962
Service Life 25 yrs

Disposal
Scrapping During 04/1963 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 04/08/1937
15C   Leicester Midland on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
15C   Leicester Midland m/e 31/12/1950
16D   Mansfield 4w/e 23/02/1952
15C   Leicester Midland 4w/e 19/04/1952
16C   Mansfield 4w/e 25/02/1956
16B   Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 09/04/1960
     Withdrawn w/e 04/08/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 15C Leicester Midland m/e 31/12/1950
LOAN 16D Mansfield 4w/e 23/02/1952
ALLOC 15C Leicester Midland 4w/e 19/04/1952
ALLOC 16C Mansfield 4w/e 25/02/1956
ALLOC 16B Kirkby in Ashfield 5w/e 30/04/1960
WDN   w/e 04/08/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
12/03/1961 Horwich Works (Works Yard) Works Yard: D3925, 40146, 42723/79, 42890, 43880, 44126, 44455, 44512/44, 48118/64, 48507, 48608, 48742/56, 51229, 51441/96, 52270, 52415. Scrap Yard: 50746, 52201/44, 52355. Erecting Shop: D3932-6, D4011/2, 12004/5/46, 42822/4/67/70, 42959/69/75/84, 43000/19, 44099, 44113/97, 44446, 44595, 48056, 48113, 48332, 48454, 48513, 48640/76, 48708, 76077/83, Car Shop: uM28306/81M, uM28586M. Paint Shop: 13247, uM28330M, and the usual preserved engines; Works Shunters: 11304/5/24/68, 47402, 51429. SLS/196105

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/08/1937 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 146
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Leicester Midland (15C)    
06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 40146    
31/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15C)    
23/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Mansfield (16D)    
19/04/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15C)    
25/02/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Mansfield (16C)    
09/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16B)    
04/08/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 40146    
04/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev