Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 831 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 1905 Week
» 27266 Month
» 260186 Year
» 1925562 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 148 on 20/08/1937
British Railways 40148 m/e 03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 20/08/1937
Withdrawal Sat 25/08/1962
Service Life 25 yrs , 5 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1964

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 20/08/1937
14B   Kentish Town on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
20A   Holbeck (MR) 4w/e 29/12/1951
19B   Sheffield Millhouses 4w/e 11/08/1956
55D   Royston w/e 20/06/1959
     Withdrawn on 25/08/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 20A Holbeck (MR) 4w/e 29/12/1951
ALLOC 55D Royston 4w/e 11/07/1959
WDN   on 23/08/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
10/12/1960 Horwich Works (Erecting Shop) Works Yard: 40173, 43023, 44125, 44262, 44602, 48084/9, 48130/88/97, 48249/54, 48457/69, 48664, 48747, 49505, 51498, 52305. Cutting-up Yard: 51227, 52139/79, 52445/52. Erecting Shop: Frames for three new diesel shunters, 12010, 40089, 40120/48, 42649, 42701/59/60/71/85, 42859, 43047, 43122, 43931, 44018 (marked to be cut-up), 44292, 44309/41, 44458, 48082, 48152/9/63, 48247/74, 48340, 48709/21, 76078/85. Paint Shop: uM28341/83M, F.R.3, L.Y.R. 1008. Works Shunters: 11304/5/24/68, 47402, 51429. SLS/196102

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
20/08/1937 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 148
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kentish Town (14B)    
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 40148    
29/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (20A)    
11/08/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Millhouses (19B)    
20/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Royston (55D)    
25/08/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 40148    
03/1964 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev