Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 41 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4956 Week
» 16193 Month
» 249113 Year
» 1914489 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 149 on 26/08/1937
British Railways 40149 m/e 04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 26/08/1937
Withdrawal Sat 28/10/1961
Service Life 24 yrs, 2 mths , 2 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 26/08/1937
14B   Kentish Town on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
3C   Ryecroft (Walsall) 4w/e 22/03/1952
20E   Manningham 4w/e 12/07/1952
21A   Saltley 4w/e 27/02/1954
18A   Toton w/e 23/04/1960
     Withdrawn on 28/10/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 3C Ryecroft (Walsall) 4w/e 22/03/1952
ALLOC 20E Manningham 4w/e 12/07/1952
ALLOC 21A Saltley 4w/e 20/02/1954
ALLOC 18A Toton 5w/e 30/04/1960
WDN   w/e 28/10/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
26/08/1937 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 149
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kentish Town (14B)    
04/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 40149    
22/03/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Ryecroft (Walsall) (3C)    
12/07/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Manningham (20E)    
27/02/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Saltley (21A)    
23/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (18A)    
28/10/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 40149    
03/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev