Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 42 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4957 Week
» 16194 Month
» 249114 Year
» 1914490 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 151 on 09/09/1937
British Railways 40151 m/e 01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 3P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 09/09/1937
Withdrawal Sat 29/12/1962
Service Life 25 yrs, 3 mths , 20 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 09/09/1937
27C   Hamilton (West) on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
60B   Aviemore 4w/e 07/08/1954
68B   Dumfries 4w/e 11/05/1957
65D   Dawsholm 4w/e 01/08/1959
67B   Hurlford 4w/e 21/11/1959
     Withdrawn on 29/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 60B Aviemore 4w/e 10/07/1954
ALLOC 68B Dumfries 4w/e 18/05/1957
ALLOC 65D Dawsholm 4w/e 01/08/1959
ALLOC 67A Corkerhill m/e 31/08/1959
ALLOC 67B Hurlford 4w/e 21/11/1959
WDN   on 29/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/03/1950 Kilmarnock Works Locomotives entering Works during March: These included Nos. 40151/87, 40610, 40902, 42165, 42211, 42915, 15350, 17280, 57457, 57594, 17655. SLS/195005
12/06/1954 Scottish Miscellany On 12th June, No. 57460 was working the Killin branch. The following day, the 13th, L.M.S. Class 5's were well in evidence at Fort William; engines on the shed were Nos. 44968, 45245, 45367, 61787, 62011, 62031, 61994/5. Nos. 44928 an 44991 arrived on an eight-coach train. Opinion of the Stanier Blacks was that they were good engines, but spoilt by the injectors, which have been giving a considerable amount of trouble. On 26th June No. 40151 was noted at Aviemore, a N.B.R. 4-4-0 (Glen?) passed Newtonmore in the down direction with a twelve-wheeled coach. No. 42130 was banking from Blair Atholl, while No. 77008 was on the shed. No B.R. Class 5 engines were seen, all trains being handled by Staniers, either singly or in pairs. 54398 'Ben Alder' is still lying at the back of Lochgorm Works. SLS/195408
14/04/1963 Hurlford MPD (in store) in store-40151, 40640/2/65, 44189/98/281, 42743, 45266, 57249/84/353/9, 55240, 67607/16/33/64/7, whilst ex LYR 52275 was en route Shieldhall. SLS/196304

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/09/1937 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 151
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hamilton (West) (27C)    
01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 40151    
07/08/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Aviemore (60B)    
11/05/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Dumfries (68B)    
01/08/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Dawsholm (65D)    
21/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Hurlford (67B)    
29/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 40151    
12/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev