Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 3755 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17161 Week
» 70177 Month
» 189704 Year
» 3216557 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
151 |
on |
09/09/1937 |
British Railways |
40151 |
m/e |
01/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
3P |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
Sat 09/09/1937 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 29/12/1962 |
Service Life |
25 yrs, 3 mths , 20 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1963 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
60B |
Aviemore |
4w/e |
10/07/1954 |
ALLOC |
68B |
Dumfries |
4w/e |
18/05/1957 |
ALLOC |
65D |
Dawsholm |
4w/e |
01/08/1959 |
ALLOC |
67A |
Corkerhill |
m/e |
31/08/1959 |
ALLOC |
67B |
Hurlford |
4w/e |
21/11/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
29/12/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/03/1950 |
Kilmarnock Works |
Locomotives entering Works during March: These included Nos. 40151/87, 40610, 40902, 42165, 42211, 42915, 15350, 17280, 57457, 57594, 17655. |
SLS/195005 |
12/06/1954 |
Scottish Miscellany |
On 12th June, No. 57460 was working the Killin branch. The following day, the 13th, L.M.S. Class 5's were well in evidence at Fort William; engines on the shed were Nos. 44968, 45245, 45367, 61787, 62011, 62031, 61994/5. Nos. 44928 an 44991 arrived on an eight-coach train. Opinion of the Stanier Blacks was that they were good engines, but spoilt by the injectors, which have been giving a considerable amount of trouble. On 26th June No. 40151 was noted at Aviemore, a N.B.R. 4-4-0 (Glen?) passed Newtonmore in the down direction with a twelve-wheeled coach. No. 42130 was banking from Blair Atholl, while No. 77008 was on the shed. No B.R. Class 5 engines were seen, all trains being handled by Staniers, either singly or in pairs. 54398 'Ben Alder' is still lying at the back of Lochgorm Works. |
SLS/195408 |
14/04/1963 |
Hurlford MPD (in store) |
in store-40151, 40640/2/65, 44189/98/281, 42743, 45266, 57249/84/353/9, 55240, 67607/16/33/64/7, whilst ex LYR 52275 was en route Shieldhall. |
SLS/196304 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/09/1937 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 151 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hamilton (West) (27C) |
|
|
01/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40151 |
|
|
07/08/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aviemore (60B) |
|
|
11/05/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dumfries (68B) |
|
|
01/08/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dawsholm (65D) |
|
|
21/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hurlford (67B) |
|
|
29/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40151 |
|
|
12/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|